Global patent index - EP 0798248 B1

EP 0798248 B1 2000-02-02 - Apparatus and method of determining a media level in a supply tray

Title (en)

Apparatus and method of determining a media level in a supply tray

Title (de)

Apparat und Verfahren zum Bestimmen eines Medienniveaus in einem Zuführbehälter

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour déterminer le niveau de médias dans une cassette d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0798248 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302118 A

Priority

US 62477296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5622364A] Apparatus and method is provided for determining a relative vertical position of a media sheet within a supply tray by sensing a picked sheet traveling through a media path, and therefrom determining time and/or distance traveled by the picked sheet. The vertical position of the media sheet within the supply tray is translated into a relative media level in the supply tray.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/00; B65H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/423245 (2013.01); B65H 2511/152 (2013.01); B65H 2511/30 (2013.01); B65H 2511/51 (2013.01); B65H 2511/514 (2013.01); B65H 2513/50 (2013.01); B65H 2553/22 (2013.01); B65H 2553/40 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1311 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/152 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2513/50 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2511/152 + B65H 2220/03
  4. B65H 2511/30 + B65H 2220/03
  5. B65H 2511/51 + B65H 2220/03
  6. B65H 2513/50 + B65H 2220/03
  7. B65H 2701/1311 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5622364 A 19970422; AR 005794 A1 19990714; AU 1621097 A 19971002; AU 711844 B2 19991021; BR 9701481 A 19981110; CA 2199110 A1 19970927; DE 69701234 D1 20000309; DE 69701234 T2 20000810; EP 0798248 A2 19971001; EP 0798248 A3 19980610; EP 0798248 B1 20000202; JP H1072142 A 19980317; KR 100431427 B1 20040827; MX 9702241 A 19970930; TW 396142 B 20000701

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980805

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B65H 7/00

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT