Global Patent Index - EP 0798407 B1

EP 0798407 B1 2000-07-19 - Lifting control method and lifting device of spinning machine

Title (en)

Lifting control method and lifting device of spinning machine

Title (de)

Hubsteuerverfahren und Hubvorrichtung für eine Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle de levage et dispositif de levage pour un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0798407 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97105265 A

Priority

  • JP 7718296 A
  • JP 7716596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798407A2] When power failure occurs, a lifting drive system is operated by a simple arrangement with a power consumption smaller than that in ordinary operation until the idle rotation of a spindle drive system is approximately stopped. The draft part and spindle drive system is driven by a main motor (M) through a driving shaft (1). The lifting drive system is independent of the draft part and spindle drive system and driven by a first drive motor (19) in ordinary operation and when power failure occurs, it is driven by a second drive motor (28) which can be driven with a power consumption smaller than that of the first drive motor. Electric power is supplied to the second drive motor (28) and a controller (30) from a battery (37) in the power failure and the controller (30) controls the second drive motor (28) until the idle rotation of the spindle drive system is approximately stopped. Yarn is wound around a bobbin in the state that it does not cause a hindrance when a spinning machine is restarted and the rewinding of the yarn in a winder process is not hindered. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798407 A2 19971001; EP 0798407 A3 19980603; EP 0798407 B1 20000719; DE 69702558 D1 20000824; DE 69702558 T2 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702558 20000824

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990427

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI