Global Patent Index - EP 0798418 B1

EP 0798418 B1 2000-06-28 - Gutter with clamping device for artificial grass

Title (en)

Gutter with clamping device for artificial grass

Title (de)

Kunstrasenklemmrinne

Title (fr)

Caniveau avec dispositif de serrage pour gazon artificiel

Publication

EP 0798418 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105282 A

Priority

DE 19612703 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798418A1] The clamp channel comprises a channel body (10) which conducts away surface water with a removable water-permeable covering (9). A clamp rail (40) is fixable to the channel body for clamping artificial grass (1) between a clamp section (19,20) of the body along its longitudinal axis and the rail itself. Fixture devices (35,36) for the covering are arranged and formed so that the covering can be fixed to the rail clamping the artificial grass. The rail has at least one traverse section (30) connected with it at one end (32), which extends over the entire width of the channel body. The first part of the fixture devices for the covering is fixed to the traverse section, preferably centrally to the channel width.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/00; E01C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/00 (2006.01); E01C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/08 (2013.01); E01C 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798418 A1 19971001; EP 0798418 B1 20000628; AT 194182 T 20000715; DE 19612703 A1 19971002; DE 19612703 C2 20000316; ES 2149524 T3 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020328

2002-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149524 T3

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701926 20000803

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194182 T 20000715

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1997-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARM, WOLFGANG

1997-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROPHET, THORSTEN

1997-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HINRICHS, SUSANNE

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL