Global Patent Index - EP 0798437 B1

EP 0798437 B1 2000-06-14 - Fastening device

Title (en)

Fastening device

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0798437 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100765 A

Priority

DE 19611752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798437A1] The front plate (2) of the housing (1) has a trough-shaped recess containing a handle which swivels on an axle parallel with the front plate. A transmission element (10) going through the back wall (4) of the housing is rigidly joined to the handle and has a connecting lever (11) linked to it on the rear side of the housing. A first carrier plate (12) for at least one attached draw-bar is turned by the connecting lever against the force of a restoring spring (16). A second rotatable carrier plate (21) for at least one attached inner release handle (25) is connected with the first carrier plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; B62D 31/02; E05B 5/00; E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/04 (2014.01); E05B 83/16 (2014.01); E05B 83/22 (2014.01); E05B 85/14 (2014.01); E05B 17/18 (2006.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/90 (2014.01); E05B 85/12 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/04 (2013.01); E05B 83/22 (2013.01); E05B 85/14 (2013.01); E05B 17/183 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 85/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798437 A1 19971001; EP 0798437 B1 20000614; AT 193919 T 20000615; DE 19611752 A1 19971002; ES 2148842 T3 20001016; HU 219557 B 20010528; HU 9700634 A1 19980128; HU 9700634 D0 19970528; PL 183033 B1 20020531; PL 319134 A1 19970929; TR 9700224 A2 19971021; YU 49146 B 20040312; YU 9797 A 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130119

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701869

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130119

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 193919 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAPPICH FAHRZEUG- UND INDUSTRIETEILE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAPPICH GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAPPICH FAHRZEUG- UND INDUSTRIETEILE GMBH, 42285 WUPPERTAL, DE

- Document: DE 59701869

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAPPICH GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAPPICH GMBH, 42119 WUPPERTAL, DE

- Document: DE 59701869

- Effective date: 20120127

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148842 T3

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701869 20000720

2000-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193919 T 20000615

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991207

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE