Global Patent Index - EP 0798510 B1

EP 0798510 B1 2000-06-21 - Heating boiler

Title (en)

Heating boiler

Title (de)

Heizkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière

Publication

EP 0798510 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101776 A

Priority

DE 19612403 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798510A2] The filler shaft (1) is filled with solid fuel, especially wood. A flow path leads from the filler shaft to a waste gas flue (11). The flow path leads via a combustion zone (9) and subsequent heat-exchange zone (10). The combustion zone with upward flow has at least one chimney-type combustion shaft (12) with vertical axis. The lower end of the combustion shaft is connected to the filler shaft by at least one inflow duct (13) opening into it at a tangent. Secondary air is introduced to the combustion shaft by at least one ventilation hole (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 5/04; F24B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/02 (2006.01); F24B 1/188 (2006.01); F24B 1/19 (2006.01); F24B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/02 (2013.01); F23B 10/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798510 A2 19971001; EP 0798510 A3 19980408; EP 0798510 B1 20000621; AT 194030 T 20000715; DE 19612403 A1 19971002

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701903

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090205

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090205

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701903 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194030 T 20000715

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980609

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI