Global Patent Index - EP 0798511 B1

EP 0798511 B1 2001-05-30 - Heating boiler and its method of operation

Title (en)

Heating boiler and its method of operation

Title (de)

Heizkessel und Verfahren zu seinem Betreiben

Title (fr)

Chaudière ainsi que son procédé de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 0798511 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104267 A

Priority

DE 19612045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798511A2] A primary air duct (3) leads into the pyrolysis chamber (1). A flue gas duct (5) connects the bottom end of the pyrolysis chamber with one end of the elongated horizontal combustion chamber (4). A suction fan (7) is connected to the other end of the combustion chamber which is fed by a secondary air duct (6). The secondary air duct opens into the flue gas duct which opens radially into the combustion chamber. The combustion chamber has an axial inner ridge (9) opposite the flue gas duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 5/04; F23B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 9/00 (2006.01); F23L 9/02 (2006.01); F23L 9/04 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F24H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23B 5/04 (2013.01); F23B 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK FI FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798511 A2 19971001; EP 0798511 A3 19980812; EP 0798511 B1 20010530; AT 201759 T 20010615; DE 19612045 A1 19971002; DK 0798511 T3 20010827; NO 308754 B1 20001023; NO 971225 A 19970929; NO 971225 D0 19970317

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2004-03-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040313

2004-03-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040313

2003-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FI FR IT LI SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970313

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201759 T 20010615

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990629

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980819

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FI FR IT LI SE

1998-08-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970313

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FI FR IT LI SE

1997-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970313