Global Patent Index - EP 0798694 A3

EP 0798694 A3 2000-03-01 - Cleanable low frequency sound attenuator for channels

Title (en)

Cleanable low frequency sound attenuator for channels

Title (de)

Reinigbarer Schalldämpfer (SD) für Kanäle für tiefe Frequenzen

Title (fr)

Atténuateur du son de fréquences bas nettoyable pour canaux

Publication

EP 0798694 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97104736 A

Priority

DE 19612572 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798694A2] The channel (1) contains perforated pieces (3) of different lengths. These are connected with chambers (4) outside the channel which form sound absorbers. The channels and or pieces are made of sheet metal, plastics, concrete or brick. The chambers can be cleaned periodically or continuously by fixed or movable nozzles (9). The chambers are connected with pipes (8) for cleaning agent via valves or other adjustments (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/172

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/172 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798694 A2 19971001; EP 0798694 A3 20000301; EP 0798694 B1 20030813; AT 247324 T 20030815; DE 19612572 A1 19971002

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59710558

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-03-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CLEANABLE LOW FREQUENCY SOUND ATTENUATOR

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970320

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL