Global Patent Index - EP 0798754 B1

EP 0798754 B1 2001-12-12 - Electromagnetic relay

Title (en)

Electromagnetic relay

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Relais

Title (fr)

Relais électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0798754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102350 A

Priority

DE 19611997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798754A2] An electromagnetic relay in which electrically conducting bars (14,15,18,19) extend along the inner surface of a cover- housing and are retained in place by means of fixture sections. Each bar is joined on one side to a terminal-lug (16,17,20,21) jutting out from the outer surface of the cover-housing, and on the other side forms a plug-connection element (24) within the interior of the cover housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798754 A2 19971001; EP 0798754 A3 19981118; EP 0798754 B1 20011212; AT 210890 T 20011215; DE 19611997 A1 19971002; JP H103839 A 19980106; US 5834998 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705724

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-02-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050213

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020225

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705724 20020124

2002-01-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020104

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210890 T 20011215

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI