Global Patent Index - EP 0798812 B1

EP 0798812 B1 2002-11-06 - Pluggable connector with locking arm

Title (en)

Pluggable connector with locking arm

Title (de)

Steckbarer Verbinder mit Verriegelungsarm

Title (fr)

Connecteur enfichable à bras de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0798812 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400657 A

Priority

FR 9603807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798812A1] The female connector casing (10) in front of the joint (28) has a series of ribs (44) which slide in the cavity of the male connector casing (14) where it engages in grooves made in the walls of the cavity, extending as far as an internal shoulder in the male casing so as to axially compress the joint. The female casing has to the rear of the joint an extension guide surface ending in an abutment. The elastic arm (38) extends towards the front above and beyond the joint across a channel bounded by the central part of the skirt (30). Each casing is a single piece with a retaining foot, contact guide plate (26) and wire guide retention plate (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5219 (2013.01); H01R 13/6272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798812 A1 19971001; EP 0798812 B1 20021106; DE 69716801 D1 20021212; DE 69716801 T2 20030911; FR 2746970 A1 19971003; FR 2746970 B1 19980612

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170323

2017-04-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170323

2017-03-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69716801

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150226 AND 20150304

2014-12-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69716801

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69716801

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69716801

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69716801

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-10-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110922 AND 20110928

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FCI

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716801 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: F.C.I.

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT