Global Patent Index - EP 0799282 B1

EP 0799282 B1 2000-04-05 - CARBON MATERIALS REACTED WITH DIAZONIUM SALTS

Title (en)

CARBON MATERIALS REACTED WITH DIAZONIUM SALTS

Title (de)

MIT DIAZONIUMSALZEN UMGESETZTE KOHLENSTOFFMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

MATIERES A BASE DE CARBONE AYANT REAGI AVEC DES SELS DIAZOIQUES

Publication

EP 0799282 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95943459 A

Priority

  • US 9516452 W
  • US 35665394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618690A1] Processes for preparing a carbon product having an organic group attached to a carbon material. The carbon material is selected from graphite powder, a graphite fiber, a carbon fiber, a carbon cloth, a vitreous carbon product, and an activated carbon product. In one process at least one diazonium salt reacts with a carbon material in the absence of an externally applied electric current sufficient to reduce the diazonium salt. In another process at least one diazonium salt reacts with a carbon material in a protic reaction medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/56; C01B 31/08; C04B 35/52; C09C 3/08; D01F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 31/00 (2006.01); C01B 31/02 (2006.01); C01B 31/04 (2006.01); C01B 31/08 (2006.01); C04B 35/52 (2006.01); C09C 1/46 (2006.01); C09C 1/56 (2006.01); C09C 3/08 (2006.01); C09D 5/02 (2006.01); C09D 7/00 (2006.01); C09D 11/00 (2006.01); C09D 11/02 (2006.01); C09D 11/18 (2006.01); C25D 11/00 (2006.01); D01F 11/14 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/63 (2013.01); C04B 35/52 (2013.01); C09C 1/46 (2013.01); C09C 1/56 (2013.01); C09C 1/565 (2013.01); C09C 3/08 (2013.01); C09D 5/028 (2013.01); C09D 7/007 (2013.01); C09D 11/037 (2013.01); C09D 11/18 (2013.01); C09D 11/324 (2013.01); D01F 11/14 (2013.01); C01P 2004/01 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/14 (2013.01); C01P 2006/19 (2013.01); C04B 2235/424 (2013.01); C04B 2235/425 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618690 A1 19960620; AR 000350 A1 19970618; AT 191493 T 20000415; AU 4471996 A 19960703; AU 692349 B2 19980604; BR 9510057 A 19980616; CA 2207475 A1 19960620; CA 2207475 C 20060829; CN 100360619 C 20080109; CN 1087756 C 20020717; CN 1175268 A 19980304; CN 1319627 A 20011031; CO 4440602 A1 19970507; CZ 291819 B6 20030618; CZ 9701843 A3 19980715; DE 69516179 D1 20000511; DE 69516179 T2 20001005; EG 21047 A 20001031; EP 0799282 A1 19971008; EP 0799282 B1 20000405; HK 1003645 A1 20010123; HU 218155 B 20000628; HU T77808 A 19980828; IL 116375 A 20010111; IL 116375 D0 19960331; IN 193026 B 20040619; JP 3980637 B2 20070926; JP H10510797 A 19981020; MX 198173 B 20000818; MX 9704385 A 19971031; NO 316384 B1 20040119; NO 972735 A 19970813; NO 972735 D0 19970613; NZ 298987 A 19990429; PE 36696 A1 19960916; PH 11995051931 B1 19991112; PH 11995051933 B1 19991112; PL 185247 B1 20030430; PL 320736 A1 19971027; RO 120200 B1 20051028; RU 2155707 C2 20000910; SI 9520130 A 19980430; SI 9520130 B 20050430; TW 415976 B 20001221; US 5554739 A 19960910; YU 48904 B 20021018; YU 76895 A 19971205; ZA 9510666 B 19960716

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151213

2016-01-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151213

2015-12-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69516179

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69516179

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CABOT CORP.

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-12-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516179 20000511

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970715;LV PAYMENT 19970715;SI PAYMENT 19970715

2000-04-05 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191493 T 20000415

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970711

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970715;LV PAYMENT 970715;SI PAYMENT 970715