Global patent index - EP 0799336 B1

EP 0799336 B1 2000-08-02 - ROTARY FIBERIZATION OF ASPHALT

Title (en)

ROTARY FIBERIZATION OF ASPHALT

Title (de)

ZENTRIFUGIERUNG VON ASPHALT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ASPHALTFASERN

Title (fr)

DEFIBRAGE PAR ROTATION DE L'ASPHALTE

Publication

EP 0799336 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95939036 A

Priority

  • US 9514236 W
  • US 36234294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9619600A1] A method for producing asphalt fibers (26) includes supplying molten asphalt (20) to a rotating asphalt spinner (10), centrifuging asphalt fibers (22) from the asphalt spinner (10), and collecting the asphalt fibers (26). The molten asphalt (20) is supplied to the asphalt spinner (10) at a temperature within the range of from about 270 DEG F (132 DEG C) to about 500 DEG F (260 DEG C). Also disclosed is a method for integrating asphalt with reinforcement fibers including the steps of establishing a downwardly moving veil of reinforcement fibers, such as glass fibers, and centrifuging asphalt fibers from a rotating asphalt spinner positioned within the veil of reinforcement fibers to integrate the asphalt with the reinforcement fibers. A method for making an asphalt roofing shingle includes the steps of assembling together a mat of asphalt fibers with a mat of reinforcement fibers, coating the assembled mats to form an asphalt-coated sheet, applying granules to the asphalt-coated sheet, and cutting the asphalt-coated sheet into roofing shingles. The invention also includes the asphalt roofing shingle made by this process. Further, the invention includes asphalt highway reinforcement products containing asphalt fibers, and the method of making such products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 9/00; D01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/18 (2006.01); D01F 9/00 (2006.01); D01F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 9/00 (2013.01); D01D 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9619600 A1 19960627; AU 4100496 A 19960710; AU 700729 B2 19990114; BR 9510479 A 19980602; CA 2208034 A1 19960627; CN 1173209 A 19980211; DE 69518255 D1 20000907; DE 69518255 T2 20001130; EP 0799336 A1 19971008; EP 0799336 B1 20000802; ES 2148580 T3 20001016; JP H10510890 A 19981020; MX 9704613 A 19971031; TW 440606 B 20010616

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20011113

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148580

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001004

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001002

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518255

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980420

1997-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OWENS CORNING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL