Global patent index - EP 0799338 B1

EP 0799338 B1 2001-04-25 - SEWING THREAD, IN PARTICULAR BULKED THREAD

Title (en)

SEWING THREAD, IN PARTICULAR BULKED THREAD

Title (de)

NÄHFADEN, INSBESONDERE BAUSCHFADEN

Title (fr)

FIL A COUDRE, NOTAMMENT FIL TEXTURE

Publication

EP 0799338 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95942639 A

Priority

  • DE 9501838 W
  • DE 4447359 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4447359A1] A sewing thread is provided at least at its surface with a dried dispersion which imparts stability to the thread and impedes thread stretching during sewing, but allows the thread to retain flexibility for sewing and which can be washed out so that the thread is restored to its original state. The dispersion can be based on an emulsifiable plastics material, such as a terpolymer of ethylene, vinyl laurate and vinyl chloride or a copolyrner of vinyl laurate and ethylene, or a polysaccharide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/46; D06M 15/333; D06M 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/22 (2006.01); D02G 3/02 (2006.01); D02G 3/46 (2006.01); D06M 11/79 (2006.01); D06M 15/03 (2006.01); D06M 15/227 (2006.01); D06M 15/248 (2006.01); D06M 15/263 (2006.01); D06M 15/327 (2006.01); D06M 15/333 (2006.01); D06M 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/03 (2013.01); D02G 3/46 (2013.01); D06M 11/79 (2013.01); D06M 15/227 (2013.01); D06M 15/248 (2013.01); D06M 15/263 (2013.01); D06M 15/333 (2013.01); D06M 23/08 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2933 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie, 4. neubearbeitete und erweiterte Auflage, 1977, Verlag Chemie, Weinheim, Band 19, S. 109
  • Römpp, Chemie-Lexikon, 9. erweiterte und neubearbeitete Auflage, 1989-1992, Geeorg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, Band 2, S. 1158 (zitiert aus der Paperback-Ausgabe)
  • Römpps. Chemie-Lexikon, 7. Auflage, 1973, Franckh'sche Verlagsbehandlung, Suttgart, S. 1938
  • Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie, 4. neubearbeitete und erweiterte Auflage, 1977, Verlage Chemie, Weinheim, Band 14, S. 241/242
  • Nähtechnische Informationen von Gütermann, N. 96, über texturierte Polyesternähfäden
  • Ausdruck einer Internetseite von Reuttex über Bauschgarne
  • Ausdruck einer Internetseite von Kupfer über Spezialnähgarne AVINO-Bausch
  • Ausdruck einer Internetseite von American & Efird, Inc., über Bauschfaden Wildcat Plus
  • Lexikon der Textilveredlung, Prof. Rouette, Laumann-Verlag, Dülmen, 1995, Band 3, S. 2479-2481
  • Lexikon der Textilveredlung, Prof. Rouette, Laumann-Verlag, Dülmen, 1995, Band 2, S. 146-147
  • Produktinformation zum Produkt "Alterfil B 250", Internet

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2296262 A 19960626; GB 2296262 B 19970430; GB 9526119 D0 19960221; AR 000409 A1 19970618; BR 9510248 A 19971104; CN 1097646 C 20030101; CN 1170444 A 19980114; CZ 284575 B6 19990113; CZ 9701912 A3 19971015; DE 4447359 A1 19960627; DE 4447359 C2 19970424; DE 4447359 C5 20090102; DE 59509222 D1 20010531; EP 0799338 A2 19971008; EP 0799338 B1 20010425; EP 0799338 B2 20080716; ES 2158144 T3 20010901; ES 2158144 T5 20090101; HK 90097 A 19970801; JP 2999265 B2 20000117; JP H10511436 A 19981104; MX 9704634 A 19970930; MY 125579 A 20060830; PL 178873 B1 20000630; PL 320664 A1 19971013; PT 799338 E 20011030; RU 2153031 C2 20000720; US 5882790 A 19990316; WO 9619603 A2 19960627; WO 9619603 A3 19960822

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121216

2014-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-06-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130617

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2008-07-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080716

2008-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2008-01-31 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20071214

2008-01-07 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: NF4A

- Free Format Text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20071214

2007-06-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070615

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AMLER WERNER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SEITZ THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AMANN & SOEHNE GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-10-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158144

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-31

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981113

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970716

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT