Global patent index - EP 0799343 B1

EP 0799343 B1 2000-03-22 - NONWOVEN FABRIC-AEROGEL COMPOSITE MATERIAL CONTAINING TWO-COMPONENT FIBRES, A METHOD OF PRODUCING SAID MATERIAL AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (en)

NONWOVEN FABRIC-AEROGEL COMPOSITE MATERIAL CONTAINING TWO-COMPONENT FIBRES, A METHOD OF PRODUCING SAID MATERIAL AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (de)

FASERVLIES- AEROGEL- VERBUNDMATERIAL ENTHALTEND BIKOMPONENTENFASERN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG, SOWIE SEINE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

MATERIAU COMPOSITE NON-TISSE-AEROGEL CONTENANT DES FIBRES A DEUX COMPOSANTS, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0799343 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95942723 A

Priority

  • DE 4445771 A
  • EP 9505083 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5786059A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/05083 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 19, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 19, 1997 PCT Filed Dec. 21, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/19607 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 27, 1996The disclosure is a composite material having at least one layer of fiber web and aerogel particles, wherein the fiber web comprises at least one bicomponent fiber material, the bicomponent fiber material having lower and higher melting regions and the fibers of the web being bonded not only to the aerogel particles but also to each other by the lower melting regions of the fiber material, a process for its production and its use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 13/00; D04H 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 5/02 (2006.01); B32B 5/16 (2006.01); D01F 8/04 (2006.01); D04H 1/413 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/4374 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/541 (2012.01); D04H 1/55 (2012.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/413 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4374 (2013.01); D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 1/541 (2013.01); D04H 1/55 (2013.01); Y10T 428/23 (2013.01); Y10T 428/238 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2918 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2929 (2013.01); Y10T 442/641 (2015.04); Y10T 442/642 (2015.04); Y10T 442/653 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5786059 A 19980728; AT 191021 T 20000415; AU 4388996 A 19960710; CA 2208510 A1 19960627; CN 1063246 C 20010314; CN 1170445 A 19980114; DE 59508075 D1 20000427; EP 0799343 A1 19971008; EP 0799343 B1 20000322; ES 2146795 T3 20000816; FI 972677 A0 19970619; FI 972677 A 19970619; JP 4237253 B2 20090311; JP H10510888 A 19981020; KR 100368851 B1 20030512; MX 9704728 A 19971031; NO 309578 B1 20010219; NO 972850 A 19970815; NO 972850 D0 19970619; PL 181720 B1 20010928; PL 320877 A1 19971110; RU 2147054 C1 20000327; WO 9619607 A1 19960627

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151220

2016-01-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151220

2015-12-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508075

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59508075

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MAI DOERR BESIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2003-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031202

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CABOT CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-04-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-03-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-12-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146795

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508075

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191021

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CABOT CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOECHST RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & C

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980618

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE