Global patent index - EP 0799354 B1

EP 0799354 B1 2000-08-23 - ANCHORAGE ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

ANCHORAGE ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ANCRAGE

Publication

EP 0799354 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95941205 A

Priority

  • GB 9502980 W
  • GB 9426239 A
  • GB 9520399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620319A1] The invention relates to anchorage assemblies and in particular to anchorage assemblies having a novel wedge arrangement, wedges for use with anchorage assemblies and an anchorage member. In order to improve wedge performance in an anchorage assembly, a wedge (21) is provided having both internally (24) and externally (25) relieved portions to give a nose area (26) which is tapered to a greater extent than the rest of the wedge (21). Under normal load conditions, the wedge (21) behaves like a short wedge having no nose relief and is highly efficient. However, under high load or load limit conditions, the nose portion (26) of the wedge (21) is arranged to deform plastically so that fretting of the stressing element (23) gripped by the wedge (21) does not occur. As well as the high performance wedge, an improved anchorage member for the anchorage assembly is provided, the anchorage member having a number of steps (34-74). The provision of steps (34-74) in the anchorage member reduces the tendency for anchorage members to be drawn into prestressed concrete structures and reduces the bursting forces within such structures. The combination of an anchorage assembly having the improved wedge and improved anchorage member is a particularly effective and advantageous one.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620319 A1 19960704; AT 195782 T 20000915; AU 4268996 A 19960719; AU 709378 B2 19990826; CN 1084818 C 20020515; CN 1175296 A 19980304; DE 69518544 D1 20000928; DE 69518544 T2 20010104; DK 0799354 T3 20001218; EP 0799354 A1 19971008; EP 0799354 B1 20000823; ES 2151611 T3 20010101; HK 1008955 A1 20030214; IN 192758 B 20040515; JP 3583440 B2 20041104; JP H10513513 A 19981222; NO 314270 B1 20030224; NO 972941 A 19970815; NO 972941 D0 19970623

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111221

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518544

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CCL STRESSENG INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *CCL STRESSENG INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-09-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-07-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CCL STRESSING INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-07-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: EDGER 363 LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CCL STRESSING INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2005-01-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *CCL STRESSENG INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20050112

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151611

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO ZINK

2000-11-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518544

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195782

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCL STRESSING SYSTEMS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANCON CCL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980519

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970723

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE