Global Patent Index - EP 0799356 B1

EP 0799356 B1 2001-05-23 - AN EXTERNAL PLASTER FACING AND A METHOD OF MAKING IT

Title (en)

AN EXTERNAL PLASTER FACING AND A METHOD OF MAKING IT

Title (de)

AUSSENVERPUTZ UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAREMENT DE PLATRE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0799356 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95942358 A

Priority

  • SE 9501566 W
  • SE 9404484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9619625A1] A plaster facing is comprised of a layer of facing tiles (15) attached to a building wall (11) and a layer (18) of plaster applied over the facing tiles. The facing tiles (15) are supported on the building wall (11) spaced therefrom and with freedom of movement relative to the wall parallel to the plane of the wall. Preferably, the facing tiles (15) are supported by support bars (12) which are attached to the wall and serve as spacers between the wall (11) and the facing tiles and to which the facing tiles are hooked from above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/02 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/02 (2013.01); E04F 13/0864 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9619625 A1 19960627; AT 201475 T 20010615; AU 4360696 A 19960710; CA 2207703 A1 19960627; CZ 293794 B6 20040818; CZ 9701957 A3 19980218; DE 69521059 D1 20010628; DE 69521059 T2 20011206; EP 0799356 A1 19971008; EP 0799356 B1 20010523; JP H10510893 A 19981020; PL 180382 B1 20010131; PL 320861 A1 19971110; SE 504997 C2 19970609; SE 9404484 D0 19941222; SE 9404484 L 19960623

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040102

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521059 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970715;LV PAYMENT 19970715

2001-05-23 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-05-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201475 T 20010615

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI NL SE

1997-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970715;LV PAYMENT 970715