Global Patent Index - EP 0799365 B1

EP 0799365 B1 2000-03-15 - OSCILLATING PISTON ENGINE AND OSCILLATING PISTON COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

OSCILLATING PISTON ENGINE AND OSCILLATING PISTON COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

PENDELKOLBENMOTOR UND PENDELKOLBENKOMPRESSOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR ET COMPRESSEUR A PISTON OSCILLANT

Publication

EP 0799365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95940939 A

Priority

  • CH 9500312 W
  • CH 390694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5769048A] PCT No. PCT/CH95/00312 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 24, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 24, 1997 PCT Filed Dec. 27, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/20332 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 4, 1996The present inventions concern rocking-piston engines and rocking-piston compressors of high efficiency. This is achieved by an arrangement in which the piston crown lies on a circular cylinder whose center coincides with the center of the connecting rod bearing and the inner face of the cylinder head lies on a circular cylinder whose center coincides with the center of the crankshaft bearing; and whereby these cylinders are in mutual rolling sealing contact in the vicinity of the top dead center. Additional means help to ensure, for an engine, that the crankshaft is driven before the top dead center or, for a compressor, that optimal compression with regard to flow is achieved with the smallest possible dead volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01B 9/026 (2013.01); F01B 2011/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5769048 A 19980623; AT 190695 T 20000415; AU 4251796 A 19960719; CA 2208550 A1 19960704; CN 1171143 A 19980121; DE 59508015 D1 20000420; EP 0799365 A1 19971008; EP 0799365 B1 20000315; WO 9620332 A1 19960704

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-12-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-11-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SALZMANN, WILLI ERNST

2000-05-24 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SALZMANN, WILLI ERNST

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508015 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190695 T 20000415

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE