Global Patent Index - EP 0799466 B1

EP 0799466 B1 2001-05-30 - PROCESS FOR DEPICTING OBJECTS USING AN IMAGE REPRODUCTION DEVICE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR DEPICTING OBJECTS USING AN IMAGE REPRODUCTION DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON OBJEKTEN MIT HILFE EINER BILDWIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REPRESENTATION D'OBJETS A L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION D'IMAGE

Publication

EP 0799466 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95942044 A

Priority

  • DE 9501854 W
  • DE 4446783 A
  • DE 19516090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620469A1] In a process for depicting objects using an image reproduction device, data that describe the form and position of objects are fed into at least one image memory. The data are read out line by line and, along with other data describing the other properties of the objects, processed to form video signals which are fed to the image reproduction device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 1/16; G09G 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/36 (2006.01); G09G 5/39 (2006.01); G09G 5/395 (2006.01); G09G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/36 (2013.01); G09G 5/395 (2013.01); G09G 5/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620469 A1 19960704; EP 0799466 A1 19971008; EP 0799466 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141221

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509310

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509310

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509310 20010705

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL AVIONIK SYSTEME GMBH

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT