Global Patent Index - EP 0799587 B1

EP 0799587 B1 2000-06-14 - Jewel for applying on a chain

Title (en)

Jewel for applying on a chain

Title (de)

Schmuckstuck zum Aufbringen auf eine Kette

Title (fr)

Bijou à placer sur une chaîne

Publication

EP 0799587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104866 A

Priority

EP 96104866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799587A1] The piece has a clamp device with a first part (9), and a second part, which is screwed to it. Each part has a passage aperture for the chain. At least one section (17) of the first part is pressed inwards when being screwed together, to achieve a clamping action. The first clamp part has two axial slots (15), forming two tongues (17), which are flexible in radial direction. The second part has an inward directed projection at one end acting with the tongues. The jewellery piece consists of two semi-spherical sections (3.1,3.2). The clamp parts pass through and hold the sections together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799587 A1 19971008; EP 0799587 B1 20000614; AT 193808 T 20000615; DE 59605440 D1 20000720; DK 0799587 T3 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRIEDRICH ZETTL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-12-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605440 20000720

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193808 T 20000615

1999-07-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: JEWEL FOR APPLYING ON A CHAIN

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981201

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961121

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE