Global Patent Index - EP 0799649 B1

EP 0799649 B1 2000-05-24 - Process for economically repairing a damage on a vehicle new exterior paint

Title (en)

Process for economically repairing a damage on a vehicle new exterior paint

Title (de)

Verfahren zum sparsamen Ausbessern einer Schadstelle an einer neuen Aussenlackierung eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Procédé économique pour réparer un dommage sur la peinture extérieure neuve d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0799649 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104116 A

Priority

DE 19613915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ293693B6] In the present invention, there is disclosed a method of time and material saving rework of mechanically damaged place, optionally minor painting defects on motor vehicle new exterior paint, where several paints (7) have been applied to the vehicle body. The method is characterized in that the mechanically damaged spot (6), optionally a minor painting defect is cleaned, filled up with a filler material (8) corresponding to color shade of top coat (4) of the original paint (7), the filler material (8) is dried and excess thereof is mechanically removed to be flush with surroundings. Then the top coat (4) corresponding to the color shade of the original paint (7) is applied as at least one touch-up cover layer (10) and in thickness of 10 to 20 microns to the filled up spot and surrounding of its periphery to a distance within 40 to 60 mm, whereby the spray gun is always guided from the damaged spot (6) center outward. Subsequently the applied cover layer (10) is let to dry and at least one first coat (11) of a clear varnish overlapping the periphery of the touch-up cover layer to a distance in the range of 20 to 40 mm is applied to the dried touch-up cover coat (10). Finally, the repaired spot is made flush with the surrounding by means of a solvent and the repaired spot is dried up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/38 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B05D 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19613915 C1 19970821; CZ 293693 B6 20040714; CZ 9701052 A3 20000517; EP 0799649 A1 19971008; EP 0799649 B1 20000524; ES 2147406 T3 20000901; JP 2002233817 A 20020820; JP 3300253 B2 20020708; JP H1057888 A 19980303; US 6214411 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2005-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-03-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040303

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147406 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAEFENHAIN-THOMA, ELISABETH

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEICKUM, GUENTER

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEDELMAIER, WERNER

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, ARNO

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970830

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE