Global Patent Index - EP 0799651 B1

EP 0799651 B1 2001-01-10 - Installation for cleaning various objects

Title (en)

Installation for cleaning various objects

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Reinigen verschiedener Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Installation de nettoyage d'objets divers

Publication

EP 0799651 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400721 A

Priority

FR 9604059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799651A1] The cabinet base (1) holds a solvent container (3), with an attached label or smart card read by the cabinet's microcontroller unit, and a rinsing reservoir (11) filled by transfer pump (P3). Nozzles inset in the top tray (4), directed into the interiors of spray-guns there arranged, are connected by the controller through pneumatic pumps (P2,P1) successively to the main and rinsing solvent containers. Cleansing cycles optionally end with air drying. The tray, enclosed, with a fume extractor, drains into the main container. Electric pumps are optionally used in non-explosive environments, rendering compressed air unnecessary. The operator has a controlling key-pad and display unit (21). Controller software ensures the main container is removed for recycling after reaching a set contamination level based on total operating time, number of cycles, etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/00; B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B44D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/006 (2013.01); B08B 3/006 (2013.01); B08B 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799651 A1 19971008; EP 0799651 B1 20010110; DE 69703858 D1 20010215; DE 69703858 T2 20010816; FR 2746679 A1 19971003; FR 2746679 B1 19980515

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703858 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000414

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971021

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB