Global Patent Index - EP 0799652 B1

EP 0799652 B1 2001-12-19 - APPARATUS FOR THE UPSIDE DOWN TREATMENT OF BOTTLES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR THE UPSIDE DOWN TREATMENT OF BOTTLES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERKOPFBEHANDLUNG VON FLASCHEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT COL EN BAS DE BOUTEILLES

Publication

EP 0799652 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102191 A

Priority

DE 19613267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799652A2] The method involves moving bottles (2) by grippers (7) along a processing track, where they are reversed, cleaned internally, and returned to original positions. The length of the cleaning and/or sterilising process during a circulation along the track, is changeable dependant upon the chosen cleaning program. The cleaning period is individually adjustable, dependant upon the bottle material. The cleaning materials are supplied or removed via channels, the active opening of which is adjustable via a rotary slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/20 (2006.01); B08B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/20 (2013.01); B08B 9/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799652 A2 19971008; EP 0799652 A3 19980812; EP 0799652 B1 20011219; BR 9700485 A 19981103; DE 19613267 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170211

2017-03-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170211

2017-02-15 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170211

2017-02-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705838

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111114

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705838 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-04-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR THE UPSIDE DOWN TREATMENT OF BOTTLES

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000522

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL