EP 0799705 A3 19980520 - Apparatus for supplying and recovering ink in an ink jet printing head
Title (en)
Apparatus for supplying and recovering ink in an ink jet printing head
Title (de)
Anordnung zur Tintenversorgung und Tintenentsorgung für einen Tintendruckkopf
Title (fr)
Appareil pour l'alimentation et la récupération d'encre pour tête d'impression à jet d'encre
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19613944 A 19960406
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0799705A2] The ink supply cassette is push-fitted in the ink jet printer and has a flat housing (1) incorporating 2 identical containers (2,3), respectively used for ink supply and extraction. Each container has a flexible foil covering the ink, which rests against the top of the container when this is full of ink and against the container base when empty, for cooperatio with electrodes (242) providing an empty indication. The front wall of the housing has coding holes (111) selecively fitted with closure elements (13), the open holes receiving coding pins of the printer.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/17 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B41J 2/1721 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 2/1728 (2024.05 - EP); B41J 2/17546 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 2/17553 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 2/1728 (2024.05 - US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4695824 A 19870922 - TAZAKI SHIGEMITSU [JP]
- [A] EP 0364284 A2 19900418 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0412459 A2 19910213 - CANON KK [JP]
- [A] US 4782754 A 19881108 - POHLIG DIETMAR [DE]
- [A] US 5477963 A 19951226 - MOCHIZUKI SEIJI [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0509747 A1 19921021 - OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 113 (M - 1094) 18 March 1991 (1991-03-18)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 037 (M - 277) 17 February 1984 (1984-02-17)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 186 (M - 1395) 12 April 1993 (1993-04-12)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
CH DE FR GB IT LI
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 19613944 C1 19970911; DE 59704057 D1 20010823; EP 0799705 A2 19971008; EP 0799705 A3 19980520; EP 0799705 B1 20010718; US 6059402 A 20000509
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 19613944 A 19960406; DE 59704057 T 19970311; EP 97104003 A 19970311; US 83843497 A 19970407