Global Patent Index - EP 0799718 B1

EP 0799718 B1 2000-05-31 - Device for notching the back of a stack of sheets pressed together

Title (en)

Device for notching the back of a stack of sheets pressed together

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufrauhen eines aus zusammengepressten Druckbogen gebildeten Buchblockrückens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rogner le dos d'un bloc de feuilles

Publication

EP 0799718 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810184 A

Priority

CH 87996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799718A1] A roughening tool (4) rotates around a rotary axis, which has machining surfaces penetrating the book block spine. The machining edges (9) rotate in a cutting plane and are arranged on the face side of the periphery of the roughening tool (4). The machining edges and the machining plane on the book block spine form a flat adjustment angle ( alpha ). The markings opposite each other, produced by the roughening tool extending laterally over the book block spine, have different machining depths. The un-roughened spine section and the rotary axis of the roughening tool form an angle of more than 90 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 5/04 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0311 (2015.04); Y10T 83/494 (2015.04); Y10T 407/191 (2013.01); Y10T 407/1952 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799718 A1 19971008; EP 0799718 B1 20000531; DE 59701797 D1 20000706; JP H1016432 A 19980120; US 6077016 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701797

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120327

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110316

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701797 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980213

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI