Global patent index - EP 0799783 B1

EP 0799783 B1 2000-01-19 - Control device for driving the pile elevator of a sheet-processing machine

Title (en)

Control device for driving the pile elevator of a sheet-processing machine

Title (de)

Steuerung für den Stapelhubantrieb einer bogenverarbeitenden Maschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler le moteur de l'élévateur de pile d'une machine à imprimer des feuilles

Publication

EP 0799783 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104449 A

Priority

DE 19613288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799783A2] The height of the stack at the loading or unloading station is governed by a hoisted stack platform driven by an electric motor which also positions a sensing arrangement in turn controlling the rate of travel of the platform. A platform carrier (1), supporting the stack of sheets (2), is lifted and lowered by means of chains (3) wound on a drum (4) rotated in either direction by a motor (6) and gearbox (5). Another gearbox (8) turns an angular position sensor (9) connected to a pair of analyzer units (10.1,10.2). An input control unit (11) sends signals to the motor control unit (7) and a monitor unit (12) which together control the rotation of the drive motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/14 (2013.01); B65H 2511/152 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2553/51 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/152 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799783 A2 19971008; EP 0799783 A3 19980128; EP 0799783 B1 20000119; AT 188943 T 20000215; DE 19613288 A1 19971009; DE 19613288 C2 19990617; JP 2801588 B2 19980921; JP H1053342 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-02-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010226

- Year of fee payment: 05

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701022

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188943

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-09-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970326

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL