Global Patent Index - EP 0799785 B1

EP 0799785 B1 2000-07-19 - Control device for the pile lifting drive of a sheet processing machine

Title (en)

Control device for the pile lifting drive of a sheet processing machine

Title (de)

Steuerung für den Stapelhubantrieb einer bogenverarbeitenden Maschine

Title (fr)

Commande pour l'entraînement de levage de piles d'une machine de traitement de feuilles

Publication

EP 0799785 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104474 A

Priority

DE 19613290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19613290C1] The motor (6) and adjacent control (7) in front of it, which moves the stack support plate (1). A meter in the form of an angle transmitter (9) is connected to the stack lifting drive mechanism and has a rotor emitting a signal corresponding to the position of the stack support plate. The signal is conveyed to the control for moving the stack support plate to the pre-set desired position. The control has an input appliance (11) giving the actual position of the stack support plate after the measurement has been taken. The meter has a calculator (10) to which the measurement is conveyed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/18; B65H 31/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/04 (2006.01); B65H 1/08 (2006.01); B65H 1/14 (2006.01); B65H 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/12 (2013.01); B65H 1/08 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/40 (2013.01); B65H 2551/10 (2013.01); B65H 2553/51 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2513/40 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19613290 C1 19970605; AT 194811 T 20000815; EP 0799785 A2 19971008; EP 0799785 A3 19980128; EP 0799785 B1 20000719; JP 2804260 B2 19980924; JP H1053343 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060315

2005-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702036 20000824

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194811 T 20000815

2000-01-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970326

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL