Global patent index - EP 0799789 B1

EP 0799789 B1 2000-11-02 - Device for fixation of a fork-lift truck on a lorry, support chassis and lorry therefor

Title (en)

Device for fixation of a fork-lift truck on a lorry, support chassis and lorry therefor

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Gabelstaplers auf einem Lastkraftwagen, Halterahmen und Lastkraftwagen dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de solidarisation d'un chariot de manutention à un camion, châssis de support et camion correspondants

Publication

EP 0799789 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400676 A

Priority

FR 9604160 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799789A1] A support chassis (11) for a forklift truck comprises two upper beams (12a,12b) and two lower beams (12c,12d) connected by uprights and cross members. There are retractable supports (13a) for the fork lift truck. The chassis is equipped with anchoring (14a,14b) and fixing (15a,15b) points which engage positioners (20,21) for fixing to the chassis. The anchoring points comprise corner iron sections (14a,14b) and the fixings comprise quick quarter turn fasteners (15a,15b). The corner iron and fastener fix the chassis onto the lorry platform and the second fix the chassis under the platform.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/07563 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799789 A1 19971008; EP 0799789 B1 20001102; DE 69703406 D1 20001207; FR 2747082 A1 19971010; FR 2747082 B1 19980515; US 5876175 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-11-12 [REG FR ER] ERRATA LISTED IN THE FRENCH OFFICIAL JOURNAL (BOPI)

- Ref Legal Event Code: ER

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-03-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703406

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2000-11-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000323

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980128

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL