Global Patent Index - EP 0799886 B1

EP 0799886 B1 2002-11-27 - Laundry detergent tablets

Title (en)

Laundry detergent tablets

Title (de)

Waschmitteltablette für Wäsche

Title (fr)

Tablettes de détergent pour du linge

Publication

EP 0799886 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97610007 A

Priority

DK 39996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799886A2] Laundry detergent tablets which in addition to usual adjuvants and additives comprise 0.1 to 15% by weight of nonionic tenside, 0.1 to 15% by weight of amphoteric tenside, 20 to 50% by weight of a polyfunctional carboxylic acid and/or a salt thereof, calculated as trisodium citrate dihydrate, 1 to 30% by weight of layered silicate and/or alkalimetal silicate and/or zeolite as well as 5 to 70% by weight of potassium carbonate. Further ingredients advantageously included in the laundry detergent tablets are sodium carbonate and/or potassium carbonate, sodium bicarbonate and/or potassium carbonate, disintegrating agents, binders, enzymes, antifoaming agents, agents preventing the running of colour, antiredepositing agents, polymers and complex-binding agents. The laundry detergent tablets have a good washing effect at the same time as they have a good storage stability and dissolve quickly in the washing water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/94; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/20; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/44 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01); C11D 1/002 (2013.01); C11D 1/44 (2013.01); C11D 1/526 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799886 A2 19971008; EP 0799886 A3 19981118; EP 0799886 B1 20021127; DE 69717336 D1 20030109; DE 69717336 T2 20030327; DK 173111 B1 20000131; DK 39996 A 19971004

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-02-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717336 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT