Global Patent Index - EP 0799887 B1

EP 0799887 B1 2003-06-11 - Fabric softener compositions

Title (en)

Fabric softener compositions

Title (de)

Textilweichmacherzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions assouplissantes pour tissus

Publication

EP 0799887 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96870041 A

Priority

EP 96870041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799887A1] There is provided a liquid fabric softening composition exhibiting excellent viscosity and phase stability as well as softness performance and comprising: a) from 0.01% to 10% by weight of a fabric softener component, b) at least 0.001% of a thickening agent selected from the group consisting of: i) associative polymers having a hydrophilic backbone and at least two hydrophobic groups per molecule attached to the hydrophilic backbone, ii) cross-linked cationic polymers that is derivable from a water-soluble cationic ethylenically unsaturated monomer or blend of monomers which is cross-linked by 5 to 45ppm of a cross-linking agent comprising polyethylenic functions, and iii) mixtures thereof, c) a component capable of sequestering metal ions and selected from the group consisting of: i) chelating components selected from the group consisting of amino carboxylic acid, organo aminophosphonic acid components, and mixtures thereof, ii) polycarboxylic building components, other than those defined under i) as chelating components, comprising at least two carboxylic radicals separated from each other by not more than two carbon atoms, and, iii) mixtures thereof. c

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/33; C11D 3/36; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3773 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/364 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/3726 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799887 A1 19971008; EP 0799887 B1 20030611; AR 006473 A1 19990825; AU 2595197 A 19971022; BR 9710451 A 19990817; CA 2250909 A1 19971009; CA 2250909 C 20021001; CN 1220694 A 19990623; MX 204196 B 20010911; MX 9808114 A 19990228; PH 11997056016 B1 20030526; WO 9736981 A1 19971009; ZA 9702774 B 19971024

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-04-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160331

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010918

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980318

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE