Global Patent Index - EP 0799918 B1

EP 0799918 B1 2000-11-02 - Yarn heater having interchangeable thread guides

Title (en)

Yarn heater having interchangeable thread guides

Title (de)

Heizeinrichtung mit auswechselbarem Fadenführereinsatz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage avec guides-fil interchangeables

Publication

EP 0799918 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104169 A

Priority

DE 19613378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799918A1] The heating system (1), to heat a running synthetic yarn or filament and especially for texturising, has a carrier with a profiled rail (6) which lies flush at the base (5) and side walls (18,19) of the guide groove. The yarn guide (3) is of ceramic or has a ceramic cladding, to be fixed in the rail (6) by holders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799918 A1 19971008; EP 0799918 B1 20001102; CN 1076410 C 20011219; CN 1180764 A 19980506; KR 100448943 B1 20041116; TW 347419 B 19981211; US 5768877 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090312

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070312

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-12-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702549 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000204

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT