Global Patent Index - EP 0799931 B1

EP 0799931 B1 2001-04-04 - Cylinder press

Title (en)

Cylinder press

Title (de)

Walzenpresse

Title (fr)

Presse à rouleaux

Publication

EP 0799931 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97103279 A

Priority

DE 19613390 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799931A1] `A roller press for a, esp. paper mfg., machine has a suction press roller (4) which with an encircling felt (6) accepts a material web (A), e.g. cardboard or paper, from a machine wire (1) etc. and a delivery press roller (7) forming a pressure gap (B) with the suction roller and taking the web for delivery to a following machine section. An auxiliary press roller (14, 24) is assigned to suction and delivery rollers to form an additional pressure gap (R, S) with each. A press felt (15, 25) is led over each auxiliary and at least one of the additional gaps is extended in the direction in which the web runs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21F 3/08 (2006.01); F26B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); F26B 13/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799931 A1 19971008; EP 0799931 B1 20010404; AT 200324 T 20010415; CA 2201668 A1 19971003; CA 2201668 C 20070313; DE 19613390 A1 19971009; JP H1025687 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080226

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703264 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200324 T 20010415

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE