Global Patent Index - EP 0799951 B1

EP 0799951 B1 2002-11-27 - Method for reinforcing building constructions by means of glued carbon fibres

Title (en)

Method for reinforcing building constructions by means of glued carbon fibres

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verstärkung von Konstruktionen durch angeklebte Kohlstofffasern

Title (fr)

Procédé de renforcement de structures de génie civil au moyen de fibres de carbone collées

Publication

EP 0799951 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400756 A

Priority

FR 9604250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799951A1] The method consists of sticking a layer of carbon fibre cloth onto a structure reinforcing surface (4). Firstly the reinforcing surface is prepared and then coated with an epoxy resin layer in the fluid state. A dry flexible cloth (3), constituted from carbon fibres, is placed onto the resin layer still in the fluid state. A sufficient pressure is exerted on the cloth to impregnate the resin and equalise the resin film. The carbon fibre cloth has the shape of a band (7) which extends in a longitudinal direction (X). The carbon fibres form a continuous wire chain parallel to the longitudinal direction and a transverse wire weft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0251 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799951 A1 19971008; EP 0799951 B1 20021127; AT 228603 T 20021215; DE 69717337 D1 20030109; DE 69717337 T2 20031016; DK 0799951 T3 20030324; ES 2187734 T3 20030616; FR 2747146 A1 19971010; FR 2747146 B1 19980710; PT 799951 E 20030331

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170403

2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170412

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170402

2017-07-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170726

2017-07-05 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20030400743

- Effective date: 20170403

2017-05-31 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 228603 T

- Effective date: 20170402

2017-04-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170401

2017-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-05 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-03 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170402

2017-04-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69717337

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160401

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187734 T3

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400743

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP EN BOSTIK FINDLEY S.

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-01-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP

2003-01-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSTIK FINDLEY S.A.

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717337 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228603 T 20021215

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTIK FINDLEY S.A.

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LABORATOIRE CENTRAL DES PONTS ET CHAUSSEES

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL (STUP)

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTIK FINDLEY S.A.

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LABORATOIRE CENTRAL DES PONTS ET CHAUSSEES

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL (STUP)

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATO FINDLEY S.A.

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LABORATOIRE CENTRAL DES PONTS ET CHAUSSEES

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE