Global Patent Index - EP 0799952 B1

EP 0799952 B1 2003-06-04 - Method for assembling prefabricated panels for swimmingpool-walls and swimmingpool-wall obtained by this method

Title (en)

Method for assembling prefabricated panels for swimmingpool-walls and swimmingpool-wall obtained by this method

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbau vorgefertigter Paneelen für eine Schwimmbadwand und dadurch hergestellte Schwimmbadwand

Title (fr)

Système d'assemblage de panneaux préfabriqués pour la réalisation d'une cloison de piscine et cloison de piscine ainsi obtenue

Publication

EP 0799952 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400584 A

Priority

FR 9604106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799952A1] Each panel (1) of the swimming pool wall is constituted by a steel plate whose opposite edges defining the height of the wall are folded from the same side to form two webs (3). Assembly of two consecutive panels located vertically side by side is by bringing into line two adjacent webs and two rectilinear sections (7,9). The first C-shaped section (7) covers the adjacent webs. The second section (9) is engaged in the first section and between the adjacent webs. A piece (30) is force fitted onto the upper part of the external section (7) and onto the panel so as to rigidify them and suppress all internal play.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/00 (2006.01); E04H 4/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/0043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799952 A1 19971008; EP 0799952 B1 20030604; CA 2200677 A1 19971002; CA 2200677 C 20041005; DE 69722501 D1 20030710; ES 2200132 T3 20040301; FR 2746835 A1 19971003; FR 2746835 B1 19980522; PT 799952 E 20030930; US 5896715 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170318

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2017-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170626

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2015-09-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2015-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FLUIDRA, S.A.

- Effective date: 20140408

2013-11-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DEL SAS

- Effective date: 20131107

2013-11-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FLUIDRA SA, ES

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-10-15 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FLUIDRA SA, ES

- Effective date: 20131009

2010-01-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-10-09 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEL SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20090918

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200132 T3

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722501 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991229

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980326

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE