Global Patent Index - EP 0799971 B1

EP 0799971 B1 2002-11-13 - Thermal barrier for turbine rotor

Title (en)

Thermal barrier for turbine rotor

Title (de)

Wärmedämmung für einen Turbinenrotor

Title (fr)

Barrière thermique pour rotor de turbine

Publication

EP 0799971 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810142 A

Priority

DE 19613472 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799971A2] The compressor rotor (5) has one or more rotating chambers (13) near its surface. The chambers are connected to the flow channel (15) via a gap (14), and located between the rotor blade rows. Each chamber has a circular cross-sectional surface. The axial extend (d) of the chamber is of approximately the same size as the axial distance (s) between two neighbouring chambers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799971 A2 19971008; EP 0799971 A3 19990707; EP 0799971 B1 20021113; DE 19613472 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708687 20021219

2002-11-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991229

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT