Global Patent Index - EP 0800052 B1

EP 0800052 B1 2002-09-18 - Reconnaissance system

Title (en)

Reconnaissance system

Title (de)

Aufklärungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de reconnaissance

Publication

EP 0800052 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104932 A

Priority

DE 19613492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800052A2] A reconnaissance device (24), with a target detecting and locating sensor unit, is positioned in an artillery shell having a spin system and a braking chute and is joined to a lift device (26) which can switch from a space-saving collapsed rest state within the shell to a released active state outside the shell. Preferably, the lift device (26) is in the form of a glide chute or kite and the reconnaissance device (24) may be equipped with a data transmitter, a GPS receiver, a computer with a data compression system, and a drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/36; F42B 10/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/56 (2006.01); F42B 12/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/365 (2013.01); F42B 10/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800052 A2 19971008; EP 0800052 A3 19981028; EP 0800052 B1 20020918; DE 19613492 A1 19971009; DE 19613492 C2 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708224

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708224 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980922

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB