Global Patent Index - EP 0800190 B1

EP 0800190 B1 2000-08-30 - Power switch

Title (en)

Power switch

Title (de)

Leistungsschalter

Title (fr)

Sectionneur de puissance

Publication

EP 0800190 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810126 A

Priority

DE 19613569 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800190A1] The circuit breaker (1) has a cylindrical arc-quenching chamber extending along a central axis (2) and filled with gaseous insulation, preferably sulphur hexafluoride. Axially spaced fixed contacts in the current path are connected together by a movable bridging contact. The arc region (24) between the fixed contacts is swept by gas transferred under pressure from the injection channels. For circuit-breaking the axial pin (3) is driven at a speed between 10 and 20 m/s. It is joined by a linkage to movable contacts so that these move at a lower speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/70 (2006.01); H01H 33/90 (2006.01); H01H 33/91 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/18 (2006.01); H01H 33/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/904 (2013.01); H01H 33/901 (2013.01); H01H 33/12 (2013.01); H01H 33/18 (2013.01); H01H 33/7038 (2013.01); H01H 33/82 (2013.01); H01H 2033/908 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800190 A1 19971008; EP 0800190 B1 20000830; CA 2200388 A1 19971004; CA 2200388 C 20050104; CN 1087480 C 20020710; CN 1167993 A 19971217; DE 19613569 A1 19971009; JP H1031944 A 19980203; KR 100445851 B1 20041014; RU 2189656 C2 20020920; US 5902978 A 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060306

2005-03-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-09-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: ABB HOCHSPANNUNGSTECHNIK AG TRANSFER- ABB SCHWEIZ AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABB BUSINESS SERVICES LTD INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (S

2000-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702266 20001005

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970310;LV PAYMENT 19970310

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB HOCHSPANNUNGSTECHNIK AG

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980309

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970310;LV PAYMENT 970310