Global Patent Index - EP 0800201 B1

EP 0800201 B1 2000-09-20 - Long-life excimer radiator, processes for manufacturing and for increasing the life of such a radiator and device for implementing said last process

Title (en)

Long-life excimer radiator, processes for manufacturing and for increasing the life of such a radiator and device for implementing said last process

Title (de)

Langlebiger Excimerstrahler, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und zur Lebensdauerverlängerung sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des letztgenannten Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Source de rayonnement à excimer à longue durée de vie, son procédé de fabrication et procédé pour l'allongement de sa durée de vie ainsi qu'un dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce dernier procédé

Publication

EP 0800201 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105297 A

Priority

DE 19613502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800201A2] In an excimer emitter with a halogen-containing gas-filled discharge space, the halogen content of the discharge space (16) is 1 x 10<-10>, preferably 1 x 10<-10>-1 x 10<-5>) mol/cm<3> per cm<2> of its interior surface and is also adjusted in accordance with the maximum power density (in W/cm of emitter length) of the emitter (11) to a value of 1 x 10<-7>-1 x 10<-5> mol/cm<3> per unit power density. Also claimed are: (i) the production of a long life excimer emitter as above, in which the interior surfaces of the discharge space (16) are exposed to a halogen-containing passivating gas, preferably chlorine, prior to gas filling; (ii) a process for extending the life of an excimer emitter, having a halogen-containing gas-filled discharge space, by exposing the discharge space (16) to IR radiation or by releasing halogen from a halogen reservoir (17) located in the discharge space (16); and (iii) an apparatus for carrying out the above processes (i) and (ii).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 5/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/70 (2006.01); H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01); H01S 3/036 (2006.01); H01S 3/225 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/70 (2013.01); H01J 61/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800201 A2 19971008; EP 0800201 A3 19980128; EP 0800201 B1 20000920; DE 19613502 A1 19971009; DE 19613502 C2 19980709; JP 4004590 B2 20071107; JP H1051081 A 19980220; US 5889367 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-29 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170326

2017-03-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702367

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702367 20001026

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LONG-LIFE EXCIMER RADIATOR, PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING AND FOR INCREASING THE LIFE OF SUCH A RADIATOR AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID LAST PROCESS

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970416

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL