Global Patent Index - EP 0800289 A3

EP 0800289 A3 2001-02-21 - A transmission system for digital audio broadcasting

Title (en)

A transmission system for digital audio broadcasting

Title (de)

Übertragungssystem für digitalen Tonrundfunk

Title (fr)

Système de transmission pour radiodiffusion numérique

Publication

EP 0800289 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97302018 A

Priority

US 62821996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800289A2] A digital audio broadcasting system includes an RF transmitter and a corresponding RF receiver. In the RF transmitter, a digitally compressed audio signal is encoded into a symbol stream that is first rotated using a frequency of 150,000 hertz (hz) before transmission to the RF receiver. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H04L 27/01; H04L 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/26 (2006.01); H04B 1/64 (2006.01); H04B 14/04 (2006.01); H04H 20/46 (2008.01); H04H 40/27 (2008.01); H04L 27/18 (2006.01); H04H 20/72 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/46 (2013.01); H04H 40/27 (2013.01); H04L 27/18 (2013.01); H04H 20/72 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] US 5406586 A 19950411 - WANG JIN-DER [US]
  • [XA] US 5471508 A 19951128 - KOSLOV JOSHUA L [US]
  • [X] US 5386239 A 19950131 - WANG TIAN J [US], et al
  • [X] EP 0244136 A2 19871104 - AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]
  • [X] US 3878468 A 19750415 - FALCONER DAVID DUNCAN, et al
  • [A] EP 0293991 A1 19881207 - PHILIPS NV [NL]
  • [A] US 5282019 A 19940125 - BASILE CARLO [US], et al
  • [A] US 5140613 A 19920818 - BIRGENHEIER RAYMOND A [US], et al
  • [E] EP 0800288 A2 19971008 - LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]
  • [A] FALCONER D D: "JOINTLY ADAPTIVE EQUALIZATION AND CARRIER RECOVERY IN TWO-DIMENSIONAL DIGITAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL,US,AMERICAN TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH CO. NEW YORK, vol. 55, no. 3, March 1976 (1976-03-01), pages 317 - 334, XP000760975
  • [A] GODARD D N: "PASSBAND TIMING RECOVERY IN AN ALL-DIGITAL MODEM RECEIVER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, vol. 26, no. 5, 1978, pages 517 - 523, XP000942625, ISSN: 0090-6778
  • [A] KRIEBEL H ET AL: "CD-QUALITAET AUS DEM ORBIT. ÖDIGITALER SATELLITENRUNDFUNK", FUNKSCHAU,DE,FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, vol. 64, no. 19, 4 September 1992 (1992-09-04), pages 68 - 71, XP000309503, ISSN: 0016-2841

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800289 A2 19971008; EP 0800289 A3 20010221; EP 0800289 B1 20050824; CA 2199760 A1 19971004; CA 2199760 C 20011009; CN 1167384 A 19971210; DE 69734036 D1 20050929; DE 69734036 T2 20060629; IL 120568 A 19991231; IL 120568 D0 19970814; JP 3243428 B2 20020107; JP H1051339 A 19980220; MX 9702410 A 19980331; TW 393840 B 20000611; US 5815529 A 19980929

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69734036

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2009-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090219 AND 20090225

2008-11-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69734036 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-03-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RECEIVER AND TRANSMITTER FOR A TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR DIGITAL AUDIO BROADCASTING

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010728

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04H 1/00 A, 7H 04L 27/18 B, 7H 04L 27/01 B

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT