Global patent index - EP 0800439 B1

EP 0800439 B1 2000-08-16 - CHECKING DEVICE FOR A MICROFINISHING MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

CHECKING DEVICE FOR A MICROFINISHING MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FEINSTBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CONTROLE D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL DE SUPERFINITION

Publication

EP 0800439 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95942674 A

Priority

  • EP 9504971 W
  • IT BO940578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620068A1] A microfinishing machine tool comprising an abrasive belt (18) and reference and clamping shoes (6, 8) for the machining of a cylindrical surface (1) of a workpiece (2). In order to perform a checking, in the course of the machining, of dimensions and geometrical characteristics (for example, possible taper errors) on the cylindrical surface (1), there is foreseen a detecting device (30) comprising a support element (32) coupled to a shoe (6) in a central limited area (74, 88) and two pairs of gauging heads (33-36) coupled to the support element for detecting diametral dimensions at two different cross sections (S1, S2) of the cylindrical surface (1). The shoe comprises seats and openings (82, 84-87) for housing the detecting device (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 49/04; B24B 5/42; B24B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 21/02 (2006.01); B24B 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/004 (2013.01); B24B 5/42 (2013.01); B24B 49/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620068 A1 19960704; DE 69518441 D1 20000921; DE 69518441 T2 20001214; EP 0800439 A1 19971015; EP 0800439 B1 20000816; ES 2150597 T3 20001201; IT 1273865 B 19970711; IT BO940578 A1 19960627; IT BO940578 D0 19941227; JP H10511317 A 19981104; US 5857895 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021215

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150597

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARPOSS S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518441

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990312

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970704

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI