Global Patent Index - EP 0800444 B1

EP 0800444 B1 2000-06-21 - CROSS-CUTTING APPARATUS FOR A WEB OF PAPER SHEETS

Title (en)

CROSS-CUTTING APPARATUS FOR A WEB OF PAPER SHEETS

Title (de)

QUERSCHNEIDER FÜR BAHNEN VON PAPIERBOGEN

Title (fr)

COUPEUSE POUR BANDES DE FEUILLES DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 0800444 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95941734 A

Priority

  • FI 9500707 W
  • FI 946114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620072A1] The invention relates to a cross-cutting apparatus for a web of paper sheets, especially for trimming the edge of a bundle of paper sheets consisting of printed matter. A cutting blade (3) is secured to a cutting roll (1) by way of a mounting axle (5) which exerts a forced action to pivot the blade (3) as determined by an eccentric wheel (7) and a guide surface (8). The guide surface (8) has its curvature selected in such a manner that it forces the blade (3) to pivot in the direction opposite to the rotating direction of the roll (1) and at such a speed in relation to the rotating speed of the roll (1) that during a working stroke said blade (3) retains its perpendicular position relative to the plane of a sheet to be cut.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/626 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620072 A1 19960704; DE 69517601 D1 20000727; DE 69517601 T2 20010215; EP 0800444 A1 19971015; EP 0800444 B1 20000621; FI 101352 B1 19980615; FI 101352 B 19980615; FI 946114 A0 19941228; FI 946114 A 19960629

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021222

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021222

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517601 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE