Global patent index - EP 0800476 B1

EP 0800476 B1 2000-01-12 - PROCESS FOR BINDING BUNCHED OBJECTS, ESPECIALLY CABLE SECTIONS, DEVICE THEREFOR AND A BINDING MATERIAL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR BINDING BUNCHED OBJECTS, ESPECIALLY CABLE SECTIONS, DEVICE THEREFOR AND A BINDING MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BINDEN VON GEBÜNDELTEN GEGENSTÄNDEN, INSBESONDERE KABELSTÜCKEN, SOWIE DAZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG UND EIN BINDEMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LIER DES ARTICLES MIS EN PAQUETS, EN PARTICULIER DES SECTIONS DE CABLES, DISPOSITIF ET MATERIAU DE LIAISON UTILISES A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 0800476 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933301 A

Priority

  • CH 9600368 W
  • CH 312095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9717260A1] In the process for binding bunched objects, especially cable sections, one end (42') of the binding material (40) having an eye (44) at the other end (42'') is taken through said eye (44) after being passed around the bunch (11), a tension securing the bunch (11) is exerted thereon and the binding material is bent back at the eye (44) to form a folded edge (46). To generate securing friction at this folded edge (46), the remaining end (47) of the binding material is pressed against the binding material (40) wound around the bunch (11). It is thus possible very easily to bind a bunch automatically with the economically produced binding material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 27/10; B65D 63/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/10 (2006.01); B65D 63/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/10 (2013.01); B65D 63/1027 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1498 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9717260 A1 19970515; AT 188659 T 20000115; CA 2208574 A1 19970515; DE 59604169 D1 20000217; EP 0800476 A1 19971015; EP 0800476 B1 20000112; JP H10512222 A 19981124; US 5873303 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021021

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-10-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-09-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FAPRO AUTOMATION A.G.

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604169

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188659

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980310

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971105

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL