Global Patent Index - EP 0800608 B1

EP 0800608 B1 2001-12-05 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MOVING PART, E.G. IN A TURNSTILE OR REVOLVING DOOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MOVING PART, E.G. IN A TURNSTILE OR REVOLVING DOOR

Title (de)

KONTROLLEINRICHTUNG EINES BEWEGBAREN TEILS WIE EIN TEIL EINES DREHKREUZES ODER EINER DREHTÜR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'UNE PIECE MOBILE TELLE QU'UNE PIECE DE TOURNIQUET OU PORTE PIVOTANTE

Publication

EP 0800608 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96937375 A

Priority

  • FR 9601715 W
  • FR 9512941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716620A1] A device characterised by the presence of angled surfaces (1aa, 1ab; 2aa, 2ab) on the notches in a rotary part (1) and on the catch of a movable lever (2), respectively, whereby when a catch release command is delivered to disengage the catch from the corresponding notch, the catch cannot remain stuck in the notch as a result of frictional forces even when torque has previously been exerted on the rotary part (1). The device is useful for controlling turnstiles or revolving doors in public areas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 11/08; E05B 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/00 (2006.01); E06B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 11/08 (2013.01); E05B 65/0071 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716620 A1 19970509; EP 0800608 A1 19971015; EP 0800608 B1 20011205; ES 2168517 T3 20020616; FR 2740883 A1 19970509; FR 2740883 B1 19980116

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-11-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141107

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETS GEORGES *KLEIN

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168517 T3

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB IT

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991007

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970729

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB IT