Global Patent Index - EP 0800694 B1

EP 0800694 B1 2000-05-24 - FIRE DETECTOR IDENTIFICATION

Title (en)

FIRE DETECTOR IDENTIFICATION

Title (de)

BRANDDETEKTOR- IDENTIFIZIERUNG

Title (fr)

IDENTIFICATION DE DETECTEURS D'INCENDIE

Publication

EP 0800694 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925845 A

Priority

  • GB 9601800 W
  • GB 9515391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9705587A1] In order to fit an electrically encoded identification slide member (30) into the fixed base unit (6) of a fire detector (2), the replaceable detector unit (8) of the fire detector retains the slide member so that when the detector unit is secured to the base unit, the slide member is automatically transferred and latched in a cooperating latch mechanism (50, 52, 60) in the base unit. Subsequent removal of the detector unit leaves the slide member in place on the base unit. Analogous retaining and latching mechanisms (96-116, Fig. 9) are provided for transferring a visual identification label carrier (90) from the detector unit to the base unit when the detector unit is secured to the base unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 26/00; G08B 17/113

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/113 (2006.01); G08B 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 26/001 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9705587 A1 19970213; DE 69608538 D1 20000629; EP 0800694 A1 19971015; EP 0800694 B1 20000524; GB 9515391 D0 19950927

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160725

2016-08-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160725

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608538 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990609

1998-01-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970521

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB