Global Patent Index - EP 0800742 A4

EP 0800742 A4 2000-03-08 - SMART PHONE INTEGRATION WITH COMPUTER SYSTEMS

Title (en)

SMART PHONE INTEGRATION WITH COMPUTER SYSTEMS

Title (de)

INTEGRATION VON EINEM INTELLIGENTEN TELEFON MIT COMPUTER SYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES INFORMATIQUES INTEGRANT DES FONCTIONS DE TELEPHONIE INTELLIGENTE

Publication

EP 0800742 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95944737 A

Priority

  • US 9516981 W
  • US 36534894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622652A1] A business telephone system employs digital signal processing in a digital telephone having a serial link (22) for connection to a general purpose computer. The Smart Phone (13) is the central intelligence for the system, which may utilize a PBX connected in a LAN to multiple computers where each computer may have one or more Smart Phones (13) connected. The Smart Phone (13) has docking bays (42, 141) which provide an ability to interchange functional modules (65, 139), including DSP modules. The docking bays (42, 141) and functional modules may be configured to PCMCIA standards. The PCMCIA docking bay (141) has a physical window (143) allowing access to an input area on a docked module (24), wherein the docked module (24) is an intelligent module (24) with a CPU (91), a memory (121), and a bus structure (67) for controlling the operations of the Smart Phone (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 17/00; H04M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 1/16 (2006.01); H04M 1/247 (2006.01); H04M 1/253 (2006.01); H04M 1/738 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 9/00 (2006.01); H04M 9/08 (2006.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/06 (2006.01); H04Q 3/58 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04N 1/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/2473 (2013.01); G06F 1/1616 (2013.01); G06F 1/1626 (2013.01); G06F 1/1632 (2013.01); H04M 1/253 (2013.01); H04M 3/42314 (2013.01); H04M 9/005 (2013.01); H04M 9/08 (2013.01); H04M 11/06 (2013.01); H04M 11/066 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0428 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0471 (2013.01); H04M 1/725 (2013.01); H04M 3/42323 (2013.01); H04N 1/107 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13003 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13034 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13093 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13096 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13103 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13106 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13107 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13175 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13209 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1322 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13299 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13322 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13389 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13396 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9622652A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622652 A1 19960725; EP 0800742 A1 19971015; EP 0800742 A4 20000308; JP 2001523403 A 20011120; JP 2003060747 A 20030228; JP 3999056 B2 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-08-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIGITAL TELEPHONE WITH FUNCTIONAL MODULES

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/00 A

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/02 B

2003-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIGITAL TELEPHONE WITH FUNCTIONAL MODULES

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/00 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/02 B

2003-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIGITAL TELEPHONE WITH FUNCTIONAL MODULES

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/00 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/02 B

2003-07-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIGITAL TELEPHONE WITH FUNCTIONAL MODULES

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 04M 17/00 A, 6H 04M 1/00 B

1999-02-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELONEX I.P. HOLDINGS LIMITED

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970701

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL