Global Patent Index - EP 0800903 B1

EP 0800903 B1 2002-11-06 - Apparatus and method for shaping honeycomb structure

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for shaping honeycomb structure

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von einem Körper mit wabenartiger Struktur

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une structure en nid d'abeilles

Publication

EP 0800903 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97105806 A

Priority

JP 11191696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0800903A1] Apparatus and method for forming a honeycomb structure capable of adjusting a shaping speed of an outer skin of the honeycomb structure, thereby preventing a defect in the skin. The shaping device is constructed by a die 10 having slits 11 for formation of a honeycomb structure and a guide ring 2 arranged downstream of the die 11. The guide ring includes an opening with an inner edge 21 and includes at a location upstream from the edge a pool portion 22 for the formation of a skin of the honeycomb structure. A temperature controller 3 is arranged in the guide ring for controlling a heating on a cooling of a ceramic material held in the pool portion 22. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/20 (2006.01); B28B 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/269 (2013.01); B28B 3/26 (2013.01); B28B 3/2654 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0800903 A1 19971015; EP 0800903 B1 20021106; BR 9701725 A 19980901; DE 69716802 D1 20021212; DE 69716802 T2 20031009; JP 3635780 B2 20050406; JP H09277234 A 19971028; US 5980227 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100408

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100408

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100408

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090402

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716802 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970919

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT