Global patent index - EP 0801183 B1

EP 0801183 B1 2000-08-23 - Fume venting device for a long barrel-vault

Title (en)

Fume venting device for a long barrel-vault

Title (de)

Rauchabzugsvorrichtung für ein langes Tonnengewölbe

Title (fr)

Exutoire de désenfumage pour une voûte cintrée allongée

Publication

EP 0801183 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400843 A

Priority

FR 9604598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801183A1] The outlet (4) is for a long semi-circular arch (1) carried by two parallel ridges (2) extending in a longitudinal direction (3). It comprises an arch part (5) extending along the arch width and movable relative to it. An actuator (6) raises this arch part to its outflow position, or lowers it into its sunken position in line with other fixed arch parts (7) to close the opening. On each side of the arch is a section (10) fixed along and under the longitudinal edge (11) of the arch movable part. The underpart is adjacent to the internal face (9) of the corresponding ridge and faces the other ridge in the closed position. Two pivoted cross pieces (12,13) maintain each section in a plane parallel to the internal face of the corresponding ridge. The crosspieces free end slides along a runner (8) on each side of the arch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0358 (2013.01); F24F 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801183 A1 19971015; EP 0801183 B1 20000823; DE 69702877 D1 20000928; FR 2747413 A1 19971017; FR 2747413 B1 19980821

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130507

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702877

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR

2000-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000823

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980415

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR