Global patent index - EP 0801194 B1

EP 0801194 B1 2001-03-28 - Multipoint locking structure for a closure mechanism with sliding rail

Title (en)

Multipoint locking structure for a closure mechanism with sliding rail

Title (de)

Mehrpunkt-Verriegelungsstruktur für einen Verschlussmechanismus mit Gleitschiene

Title (fr)

Structure de verrouillage multipoint pour mécanisme de fermeture à glissière

Publication

EP 0801194 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96500040 A

Priority

EP 96500040 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801194A1] The sliding door multi-point lock comprises several bolts (1) connected to metal plates (3) which slide linearly in guide structures (5,5a), on a door side member, by displacing a central bolt. Each locking bolt is inserted in a block (8) which is firmly connected to the plates encastred in corresponding holes appropriately separated in the plates. The plates are housed, with the insertion of anti-friction joints (18), to slide inside C shaped guides (10). In the bottom of the guides are long openings through which the blocks are put (8). The guides have fixed frames (12) open on the sides for housing the blocks. These blocks can be displaced linearly against a spring (13) which is compressed by displacement of the plates corresponding to opening of the door. The block has in its front part under the bolt a sloping internally threaded drilling (15). The bolt is inserted in a hole (16) in the block and its position fixed and/or adjusted by a screwed part (17) in the drilling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/08 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/087 (2013.01); E05C 9/006 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01); E05B 17/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801194 A1 19971015; EP 0801194 B1 20010328; DE 69612273 D1 20010503; DE 69612273 T2 20011115; ES 2157415 T3 20010816; GR 3036107 T3 20010928; PT 801194 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091012

2009-10-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091012

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070412

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070412

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157415

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIESSE GROUP IBERIA, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990518

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980406

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT