Global Patent Index - EP 0801201 B1

EP 0801201 B1 2002-11-20 - System for fixing a toughened glass sheet and accordingly equipped glass sheet

Title (en)

System for fixing a toughened glass sheet and accordingly equipped glass sheet

Title (de)

Einsteckschloss

Title (fr)

Système permettant un assemblage entre une feuille de verre trempé et un autre objet, feuille de verre équipée d'un tel système

Publication

EP 0801201 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400699 A

Priority

FR 9604612 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801201A1] The connection between a toughened glass sheet (1) having a reamed hole and another glass sheet or metal structure comprises two parts. One part (7), which fits the hole conical surface (3), has a force perpendicular to the hole axis exerted on it. The other (14) is supported on the side (6) of the sheet opposite the reamed holed and supports the reaction force. The force is sufficient to establish on the glass sheet a system of minimum localised compression restraints at a distance from the hole edge greater than 1% of the hole maximum diameter. The metal connecting piece part fitting the reamed hole conical surface has a cone opening angle greater than that of the hole. An aluminium sleeve (23) is interposed between the connecting piece and the hole to avoid excessive local constraints.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/54; E04B 2/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E06B 3/5436 (2013.01); E05D 2005/0253 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801201 A1 19971015; EP 0801201 B1 20021120; AT 228199 T 20021215; DE 69717184 D1 20030102; DE 69717184 T2 20030828; DK 0801201 T3 20030317; ES 2186850 T3 20030516; FR 2747424 A1 19971017; FR 2747424 B1 19981030; PT 801201 E 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170405

2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170328

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170327

2017-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170704

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170326

2017-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 228199 T

- Effective date: 20170327

2017-05-03 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170326

2017-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-03 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170327

2017-03-29 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170326

2017-03-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69717184

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186850 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717184 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228199 T 20021215

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991214

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971108

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE