Global Patent Index - EP 0801446 B1

EP 0801446 B1 2001-12-05 - Shielded connector, in particular having a plug and a fixing base for a plane support

Title (en)

Shielded connector, in particular having a plug and a fixing base for a plane support

Title (de)

Abgeschirmter Verbinder, insbesondere mit Stecker und Ablagefläche zum Verbinden auf einer ebenen Unterlage

Title (fr)

Connecteur blindé, notamment du type comprenant une fiche et une embase destinée à être fixée à un support plan

Publication

EP 0801446 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400617 A

Priority

FR 9604596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801446A1] The connector comprises the base (1) for attachment to the circuit board (CI), and the plug coupled mechanically and electrically to it. A wall (13) of the base is covered with a conductive screen (5) extended forwards into folded elastic tongues or wipers (52) which exert pressure on the plug at right angles to the direction of insertion. The screen of the base is formed of a sheet (50) with two rows of complementary cutouts which engage the lower leading edge (16) of the base. Cutouts in the front row (53) slide over a sloping edge (19b), and those in the back row (54) engage an upright edge (19a) of the lip which is trapped between the two rows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6582 (2013.01); H01R 12/7064 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801446 A1 19971015; EP 0801446 B1 20011205; DE 69708734 D1 20020117; DE 69708734 T2 20020814; FR 2747517 A1 19971017; FR 2747517 B1 19980515; JP H1083865 A 19980331; US 5879193 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708734 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/16 A

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980130

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE