Global Patent Index - EP 0801476 A3

EP 0801476 A3 2000-05-10 - Method for the reception and the evaluation of RDS-data streams of a plurality of transmitters

Title (en)

Method for the reception and the evaluation of RDS-data streams of a plurality of transmitters

Title (de)

Verfahren für den Empfang und die Auswertung von RDS-Datenströmen mehrerer Sender

Title (fr)

Méthode de réception et de l'évaluation des données RDS en provenance d'une pluralité d'émetteurs

Publication

EP 0801476 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97105768 A

Priority

DE 19614322 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801476A2] The reception method uses a single receiver for reception of radio data signal (RDS) streams from a number of transmitters. the method involves tuning the receiver to one transmitter and evaluating the data streams received from the other transmitters via a RDS decoder. The receiver is re-tuned to a second transmitter for a short interval, a predetermined number of times for extraction of synchronisation information used for subsequent short-term re- tuning of the receiver to the second transmitter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 20/34 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 20/34 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801476 A2 19971015; EP 0801476 A3 20000510; EP 0801476 B1 20070613; AT 364939 T 20070715; DE 19614322 A1 19971016; DE 59712853 D1 20070726

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59712853

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080408

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-01-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070613

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712853 P 20070726

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG CAR INTERMEDIA SYSTEM GMBH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI