Global patent index - EP 0801515 B1

EP 0801515 B1 2000-02-09 - Resistance apparatus to warm up containers, especially laboratory containers

Title (en)

Resistance apparatus to warm up containers, especially laboratory containers

Title (de)

Widerstandvorrichtung zum Erwärmen von Behältern, bzw. Laborbehältern

Title (fr)

Dispositif à résistance électrique pour le chauffage d'objets ou de récipients notamment à usage de laboratoire

Publication

EP 0801515 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400779 A

Priority

FR 9604449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0801515A1] The equipment comprises a trapezoidal-section pedestal (1) with a rectangular top surface (3) on which a heater comprising three concentric shells (13-15) is supported by sets of spacers (30-35). The innermost shell (15) surrounds a stack of dissipative plates (48a,48b) and screening plates (42a,42b) spaced apart under the heating element (19) and a grid (16) of radially interconnected circular or helical wires. The innermost shell is open at the level of the preferably spiral element. The taller central and outer shells are open at the higher level (P) of the grid. The dissipative plates have holes for the spacers and/or electrical connections to the element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0801515 A1 19971015; EP 0801515 B1 20000209; DE 69701267 D1 20000316; DE 69701267 T2 20000928; FR 2747458 A1 19971017; FR 2747458 B1 19980522

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120404

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHEMLA RICHARD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-06-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060601

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: INFOSUISSE INFORMATION HORLOGERE ET INDUSTRIELLE

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI SE

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970923

1997-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI SE